Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bryant, Keith, Bryant, Rina, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Tyler, Ty, against State Farm Florida Insurance C, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with MONICA BRASINGTON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMONICA BRASINGTON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event JURY TRIAL on 6/5/2017 0900 AM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CANCELLED on 4/27/2017 | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on 5/26/2017 0130 PM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CANCELLED on 4/27/2017 | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.