Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcrae, Jason, Swearengin, Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Berman, Russell Frank, against Brett, Gary, Griffin, Lorenza, Ma Rigoni Inc, represented by Berman, Russell Frank, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE DISPOSITION REPORT | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR PERSON WITH MOST KNOWLEDGE PKURSUANT TO RULE AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY NON-PARTY, SPINE CENTERS OF AMERICA, INC. | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR KRAPF LEGAL | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFRENCE | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS AMENDED | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS CONSENTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF MEDIATION DEADLINE | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.