Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cit Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Lonnie J Cruse, Rachel M Cruse, United States Of America Actin, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF on 8/9/2016 0930 AM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CANCELLED on 5/17/2016 | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM FROM 4-12-2016 | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF scheduled on 8/9/2016 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MONICA BRASINGTON presiding. | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS FOR 8-9-2016 AT 9:20AM | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate, ORDER GRANTING RELIEF; ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER REQUIRING PRESENTATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE, AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS ON 4-12-2016 AT 9:30AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.