Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hoequist, Adison, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Rigby, Barry William, against Llc, Property Resource Enterpr, Mckoy, Douglas K, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF on 4/22/2016 1015 AM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CANCELLED on 3/30/2016 | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF scheduled on 4/22/2016 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge MONICA BRASINGTON presiding. | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event STATUS CONFERENCE on 3/4/2016 1000 AM Judge SHEREE LANCASTER results CONTINUED on 2/26/2016 | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE TO 4-22-2016 AT 10:15AM | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Event STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/4/2016 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding. | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 3-4-2016 AT 10:00AM | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.