Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bass Farms Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Basso, Frank, All Sweetwatermelons Inc, Sweet Melon Growers Llc, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SERVICE | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM FROM 11-6-2015 | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/6/2015 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MONICA BRASINGTON presiding. | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/6/2015 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT ROUNDTREE presiding. | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - HEARING DATE 11-6-2015 AT 9:30AM | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: GRIFFIS III, STANLEY H Assigned | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2962 | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.