Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roberts, Wanda L, Roberts, David E, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Us Bank, Keyes, Patricia, Matthew, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | QUIET TITLE SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/15/2015 at 1020 AM, MX - Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS III presiding. | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR 4-15-2015 AT 10:20AM | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED CERTIFIED MAIL ON US BANK NA AS TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF MANUFACTURED HOUSING CONTRACT SENIOR/SUBORDINATE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATE TRUST 1999-1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.