Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Us Bank National Association A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Eligon, Charlene Kim Archer, against Lane, Jason, Lane, Kelli, Unknown Spouse Of Ray Fitzgera, Unknown Spouse Of Stanley Wats, Unknown Tenant, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with COKER, MARY DAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOKER, MARY DAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM 178084.13
Date: November 06, 2012CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 06, 2012COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2012SUMMONS TO KELLI LANE
Date: November 06, 2012MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: November 06, 2012SUMMONS TO JASON LANE
Date: November 06, 2012NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 06, 2012SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON
Date: November 06, 2012RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNK TENANTS
Date: December 04, 2012SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RAY FITZGERALD
Date: November 06, 2012SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: November 06, 2012ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: November 13, 2012RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNK SPOUSE OF RAY FITZGERALD
Date: December 04, 2012RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JASON LANE 1/15/13
Date: January 30, 2013RESPONSE FROM KELLI & JASON LANE
Date: January 22, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: January 24, 2013HEARING FORM FROM 7/8/13
Date: July 15, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON
Date: January 30, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON KELLI LANE 1/15/13
Date: January 30, 2013VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO CONSTRUCITVE SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2013AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY
Date: March 11, 2013NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: March 11, 2013NOTICE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS
Date: October 10, 2013NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/14/13 @1:30PM
Date: July 11, 2013NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DFNDT
Date: October 10, 2013VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS
Date: October 10, 2013AFFIDAVIT STIPULATION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 05, 2014DEFAULT ON UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON
Date: October 11, 2013MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: October 23, 2013RETURNED MAIL FROM JASON LANE
Date: November 12, 2013ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLNTF
Date: November 12, 2013NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/9/13 @9:30AM
Date: November 12, 2013NJT REVIEW SHEET
Date: March 25, 2014HEARING FORM FROM 10/14/13
Date: November 12, 2013RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON
Date: November 12, 2013HEARING FORM FROM 3/10/14
Date: April 15, 2014RETURNED MAIL FROM JASON LANE
Date: December 31, 2013RETURNED MAIL FROM KELLI LANE
Date: November 12, 2013HEARING FORM FROM 12/9/13
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS
Date: December 06, 2013MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONF
Date: December 06, 2013FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 25, 2014RETURNED MAIL FROM KELLI LANE
Date: December 31, 2013RETURNED MAIL FROM UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STANLEY
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE SETTING NON JURY TRIAL 3/10/14 @9:30AM
Date: December 31, 2013Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: March 25, 2014WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 04, 2014RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON - Final Judgment
Date: March 31, 2014CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: February 04, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: April 15, 2014STIPULATION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 05, 2014NOTICE OF SALE 7/21/14 @11:00AM
Date: March 25, 2014RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK PERSON IN POSSESSION - Final Judgment
Date: March 31, 2014NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 22, 2014RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON - order vacating judgment
Date: May 13, 2014RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK TENANTS - order vacating judgment
Date: May 13, 2014PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: June 26, 2013Report
Date: July 02, 2013MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON JASON & KELLI LANE & UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON
Date: October 10, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON - order vacating judgment | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK TENANTS - order vacating judgment | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT, DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS CANCELLING SALE SET FOR 7/21/14 & RELEASING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM FROM 3/10/14 | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT, DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS AND CANCEL SALE 7/21/14 | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS RECEIVED & FILED BY THE CLERK- ORIGINAL NOTE & ALLONGE, RECORDED MORTGAGE ET AL | |
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK SPOUSE OF STANLEY WATSON - Final Judgment | |
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM UNK PERSON IN POSSESSION - Final Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.