Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Razor Capital Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Stegall, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Mary Day Coker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary Day Coker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2012 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR WRITNESS AT FINAL HEARING OR TRIAL | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 7/29/14 | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESS AT FINAL HEARING OR TRIAL | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR PLNTF | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/29/2014 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge MARY COKER presiding. | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 7/29/14 @2:30pm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.