Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pelatti, Christopher J, against Roberts, Karissa, Roberts, Christopher, Capital, City Bank, Cole, Levi, Unknown, Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with YSLETA MCDONALD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYSLETA MCDONALD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 2086 | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING-AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF KEN ABELE FOR CAPITAL CITY BANK | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR CAPITAL CITY BANK ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.