Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital City Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Harrington, Phyliss, Cole, Levi, Rhoads, Suzanne, Bivens, Garrett, Bivens, Cindy, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Ysleta W. McDonald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYsleta W. McDonald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Nonhomestead Resd $50,001-249,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-BETSY DOLL CAPITAL CITY BANK 2/12/13 | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO CAPITAL CITY BANK | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 911 | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION & SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY AS TO PUBLICATION COSTS | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO CAPITAL CITY BANK | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET- $100.00 TO PLNTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.