Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Cota, Brian J, against Sevilla, Joseph Lee, represented by Mendoza, Marlies D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Ochoa, Frank J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOchoa, Frank J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Filed | |
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript - Change of Plea & Sentence, Filed | |
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Anderson, Clifford R, III |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Information
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.