Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 08, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2021UNIFORM ORDER
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | C1 - DISP UPDATE | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISS BEFORE HEARING - OTHER | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY J SET FOR 1/30/2023 AT 3:30 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID FRANK | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY JOSEPH ALAN BLECHINGER | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE: JOSEPH ALAN BLECHINGER 7/1/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.