Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY DEFAULT | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING RECOMMENDED REPORT OF MAGISTRATE ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE WITH NO MINOR CHILDREN/PROPERTY/LIABILITIES AND AWARD FOR 1/2 OF DIVORCE FILING FEE (EXCEPTIONS NOT FILED) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER APPROVING RECOMMENDED REPORT OF MAGISTRATE ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE WITH NO MINOR CHILDREN/PROPERTY/LIABILITIES AND AWARD FOR 1/2 OF DIVORCE FILING FEES (EXCEPTIONS NOT FILED) O. R. BOOK 904 PAGES 1817-1820 | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED REPORT OF MAGISTRATE ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE WITH NO MINOR CHILD(REN)/PROPERTY/LIABILITIES AND AWARD FOR HALF OF DIVORCE FILING FEES (EXCEPTIONS NOT WAIVED AS TO COSTS AND FEES AWARD) | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT FINAL HEARING SET FOR 10/7/2021 AT 11:30 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE PEDROSO, ACELO I | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE/TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE (SIGNED) | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE (WITHOUT JUDGES' SIGNATURE) | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CONRAD SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.