Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: December 02, 2021DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 07, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 07, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 07, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 07, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 18, 2022MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR
Date: August 23, 2022CORRESPONDENCE
Date: August 18, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 18, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 16, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO SERVICE@MSPGLAWGROUP.COM
Date: June 07, 2021UNIFORM ORDER
Date: June 07, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 07, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202104454
Date: June 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | C1 - DISP UPDATE | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISS BEFORE HEARING - OTHER | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT JURY TRIAL SET FOR 8/22/2022 AT 8:30 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID MICHAEL FRANK | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT JURY SELECTION SET FOR 8/19/2022 AT 8:30 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID MICHAEL FRANK | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/15/2022 AT 9:00 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID MICHAEL FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.