Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT
Date: September 09, 2022PLAINTIFF'S PRELIMINARY WITNESS LIST
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S PRELIMINARY WITNESS LIST | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | EXPERT WITNESS LIST | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.