Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Home.Forclosure $50001-249,999 case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryHome.Forclosure $50001-249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2022NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S ADMITTED EVIDENCE
Date: May 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME, EFFORT AND COSTS
Date: May 13, 2022RETURN MAIL TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, ETC OF THE ESTATE OF ARCHIE GLENN, DEC.
Date: September 01, 2022ADDITIONAL COST AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 19, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: August 15, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: October 04, 2022DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 21, 2022RETURN MAIL TO UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ARCHIE GLENN
Date: October 24, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: October 13, 2022AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO CORRECT THE PURCHASER/PLAINTIFF NAME
Date: October 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AS RECORDED AT OR BK 923 PGS 1353-1354
Date: October 04, 2022NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE (COPY FURNISHED TO GCT TO BE PUB ON 8/25 AND 9/1 2022)
Date: August 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 26, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: September 02, 2022IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE: SALE DATE SEPTEMBER 22, 2022
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: May 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2022UNIFORM ORDER
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH
Date: July 13, 2021LIS PENDENS AS RECORDED AT OR BOOK 896 PAGE 435-436
Date: May 28, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202104119
Date: May 27, 2021ANSWER OF TALLAVANA HOA
Date: June 07, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: May 26, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS
Date: December 08, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: MAY 23, 2022
Date: February 24, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EST. OF ARCHIE GLENN, DECEASED
Date: November 16, 2021MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: November 21, 2022RETURN MAIL TO UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF ARCHIE GLENN DEC
Date: September 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE (SOLD TO PLAINTIFF FOR $100.00)
Date: September 22, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 26, 2021VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY
Date: May 26, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202206990
Date: September 22, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: September 22, 2022CLERK'S FORECLOSURE BID FORM
Date: September 22, 2022NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: May 11, 2022CERTIFICATE
Date: May 26, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: May 06, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: July 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE: USA HUD 6/8/21
Date: July 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE OF TALLAVANA HOA ON 6/4/2021
Date: July 19, 2021RETURN OF NON-SERVICE OF UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE EST OF ARCHIE GLENN, DECEASED
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED
Date: July 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE PUBLISHED IN GCT ON 7/22 & 7/29/2021
Date: July 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: February 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION: POSTED RESIDENTIAL ON 5/31/2023
Date: June 16, 2023ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: March 15, 2023WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: March 17, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: December 21, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION: POSTED RESIDENTIAL ON 5/31/2023 | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED AFTER RE-OPEN | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.