Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 27, 2022DEFENDANT'S CASE STATUS REPORT
Date: March 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISS BEFORE HEARING - OTHER | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | C1 - DISP UPDATE | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S CASE STATUS REPORT | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUIRING CASE STATUS REPORT | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION PENDING APPRAISAL: GRANTED | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWERS | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASTLE KEY INS. CO.'S MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION PENDING APPRAISAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.