Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | EVENT CIVIL CONTEMPT SET FOR 7/18/2023 AT 9:00 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE SMITH, JACQUELINE H | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE RE-OPENED. REASON : MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC HEARING VIA ZOOM | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (AMENDED TO ADJUST CHILD SUPPORT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.