Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED. | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSSED ON CNT:1 | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MISD - ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 11/30/2021 AT 10:30 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF PRES VIA ZOOM BEF J GARNER-OFFERED DIVERSION-PASS 6 WEEKS. | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MISD - ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 9/28/2021 AT 10:30 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MISD - ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 8/17/2021 AT 1:45 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MISD - ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 8/3/2021 AT 10:30 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF NP VIA ZOOM BEF J GARNER - PASS 08/03/2021 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED. | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | FILED ON CNT:1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.