Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
INFORMATION FILED.
Date: June 09, 2021MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING FILED.
Date: July 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF FTA BEF J GARNER-ATTY NYSTRAND PRES-CAPIAS ORDERED, $250 BOND. | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/2/2022 AT 9:45 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP BEF J GARNER-ATTY NYSTRAND PRES-CM SET 11/2/22. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 9/28/2022 AT 9:45 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING FILED. | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT HEARINGS FILED. | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (GRANTED) ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT HEARINGS FILED. | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 8/3/2022 AT 9:45 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 7/6/2022 AT 9:45 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP (LEON CJ) BEF J GARNER-ATTY NYSTRAND PRES-CM SET 7/6/22. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.