Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202109514
Date: December 21, 2021ARREST/ NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED.
Date: May 24, 2021COURT DISPOSITION FILED.
Date: December 17, 2021ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI FILED.
Date: October 07, 2021INFORMATION FILED.
Date: June 25, 2021ROR SLIP FILED.
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202109514 | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF MADE PAYMENT IN OFFICE-PAID IN FULL. | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT PAYMENT DUE SET FOR 4/12/2022 AT 2:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DISPOSITION FILED. | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BEFORE A JUDGE: PLEA AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RIGHTS: AND, ORDER OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE FILED-PNC TO THE AMENDED CHARGE OF POSS OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA, AW, $220 CC, $50 COP, $50 COD, $50 PD FEE, 90 DTP. | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSED COURT COST - MISDEMEANOR OF $220.00 | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSED MM COST OF PROSECUTION OF $50.00 | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSED PUBLIC DEFEND FEE COUNTY OF $50.00 | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJUDICATION WITHHELD ON CNT:1 | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSED MM PUBLIC DEFENDER ASST OF $50.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.