Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ARREST/ NOTICE TO APPEAR/ PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT FILED.
Date: May 20, 2021NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED.
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED. | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI ON CNT:1 | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MISD - ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 8/17/2021 AT 1:45 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MISD - ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 8/3/2021 AT 10:30 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF PRES. VIA ZOOM BEF J GARNER-POSSIBLE DIVERSION-PASS 08/03/2021 | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT MISD - ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 6/29/2021 AT 10:30 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST/ NOTICE TO APPEAR/ PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT FILED. | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED WITH CLERK | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR ON SEQ:1 | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE ASSIGNED: KATHY GARNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.