Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW CAPIAS FILED.
Date: May 17, 2022DEF FTA BEF J GARNER-CAPIAS ORDERED, $250 BOND.
Date: March 30, 2022ORDER (GRANTING) MOTION TO WITHDRAW CAPIAS AND RESET COURT DATE FILED.
Date: May 17, 2022ARREST/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED.
Date: May 19, 2021ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI FILED.
Date: June 25, 2021INFORMATION FILED.
Date: May 19, 2021SURETY BOND PSE5163229 POSTED FOR $250.00
Date: May 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 1/4/2023 AT 11:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP BEF J GARNER-CM SET 1/4/23. | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/30/2022 AT 1:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF IN CRT (EXC) BEF J GARNER-CM SET 11/30/22. | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/2/2022 AT 11:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP BEF J GARNER-CM SET 11/2/22. | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 8/31/2022 AT 11:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP BEF J GARNER-CM SET 8/31/22. | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW CAPIAS FILED. | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 7/6/2022 AT 1:45 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.