Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED.
Date: March 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED. | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI ON CNT:1, CNT:2 | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CASH BOND 08540 REFUNDED FOR $250.00 | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 3/30/2022 AT 9:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP BEF J GARNER-ATTY AKBAR PRES-POSSIBLE DPA-CM SET 3/30/22. | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 3/2/2022 AT 9:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP VIA ZOOM BEF J GARNER-ATTY AKBAR PRES-POSSIBLE DPA-CM SET 3/2/22. | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 1/5/2022 AT 11:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF PRES VIA ZOOM BEF J GARNER-ATTY AKBAR PRES-POSSIBLE DPA-CM SET 1/5/22. | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT P/T FOR JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/6/2021 AT 10:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.