Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Family Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | C2 - DISP UPDATE | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SUSTAINING OBJECTION AND GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PATERNITY ACKNOWLEDGMENT-STATE OF GEORGIA | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT HEARING SET FOR 10/6/2021 AT 9:30 IN ANNEX WEST ENTRANCE WITH JUDGE DAVID MICHAEL FRANK | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTION ON PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: KAREN P. CAMPBELL | |
February 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR RESPONDENT, WILLIE B SLOAN, SR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.