Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CASH BOND 08533 POSTED FOR $250.00
Date: March 11, 2021PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202104577
Date: June 11, 2021WARRANT SERVED FILED.
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURTESY LETTER RETURNED - UNCLAIMED, FILED. | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURTESY LETTER SENT FOR $225.00 | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO MAKE A PAYMENT RETURNED, NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, FILED. | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT PAYMENT DUE SET FOR 10/12/2021 AT 2:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202104577 | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BEFORE A JUDGE: PLEA AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RIGHTS FORM: AND, ORDER OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE FILED-WP, PNC, AG, $220 CC, $105 FINE, $50 COP, $50 COD, $50 PD FEE, 90 DTP. | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT DISPOSITION FILED. | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT PAYMENT DUE SET FOR 9/14/2021 AT 2:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSED FINE MISDEMEANOR OF $105.00 | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSED COURT COST - MISDEMEANOR OF $220.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.