Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) County Civil (15,001 To 30,000) case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Civil (15,001 To 30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
|
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 16, 2022DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 19, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: TIMOTHY R ENGELBRECHT | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: CRISTIAN ZELAYA | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: JOSHUA A BLACKSTEN | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIP FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.