Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryDiscrimination Employ/Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT
Date: March 31, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION
Date: February 17, 2022DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS
Date: February 07, 2022PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RESOLUTION
Date: February 21, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT "3" TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 10, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CITY OF QUINCY
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 03, 2021PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND QUASH SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT
Date: June 03, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 09, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT "4" TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: August 26, 2021ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: August 25, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS VIA VIDEO-CONFERENCE ZOOM
Date: September 18, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 06, 2021DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST
Date: December 01, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 10, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF READINESS FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: June 16, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 06, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT A TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND QUASH SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 08, 2021DEFENDANT'S AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION TO SCHEDULE HEARING ON CITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 29, 2021DEFENDANT CITY OF QUINCY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: December 14, 2021MEDIATION REPORT: IMPASSE
Date: December 20, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT
Date: May 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE: CITY OF QUINCY (VAN PERKINS) ON 2/19/21
Date: March 10, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: December 10, 2020PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202008958
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT "1" TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2021DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, STATEMENT OF FACTS, AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 13, 2021DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: December 13, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT "2" TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: December 08, 2021DEFENDANT'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 13, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO MARIE MATTOX, ESQUIRE
Date: December 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RESOLUTION | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHIBIT "A" | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S AMENDED WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.