Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
MOTION TO DISMISS FILED.
Date: August 22, 2022NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED.
Date: August 30, 2022COURT DISPOSITION FILED.
Date: August 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT DISPOSITION FILED. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AA20667325 RELEASED FOR $100.00 | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF IN CRT BEF J FLURY REP BY ATTY ITURRALDE, ASA HASSLER-STATE NOLLE PROSSED THIS CASE. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI ON CNT:1 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED. | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP (FSH) BEF J GARNER-ATTY ITURRALDE NP-CM SET 9/28/22. | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP BEF J GARNER-ATTY NESBETH PRES FOR ATTY ITURRALDE-CM SET 7/6/22. | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF NP VIA ZOOM BEF J GARNER-ATTY ITURRALDE PRES-CM SET 4/27/22. | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM RETURNED, NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.