Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AMENDED ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED.
Date: January 19, 2021NO INFORMATION FILED.
Date: February 09, 2021ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI FILED.
Date: December 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION FILED. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DROPPED/ABANDONED ON CNT:1 | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CASH BOND 08530 REFUNDED FOR $500.00 | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 4/28/2021 AT 11:00 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF IN CRT BEF J GARNER VIA ZOOM, REP BY PD WOLIVER, PNG, CM SET 4/28. | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED. | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT HEARING SET FOR 2/2/2021 AT 12:10 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST FOR AMENDMENT TO "NO CONTACT" PROVISION, DENIED, SET MOTION FOR HEARING ON NEXT DOCKET WHERE HIS CASE IS SET. | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI FILED. | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.