Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ROR SLIP FILED.
Date: December 14, 2020MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONFLICT COUNSEL FILED.
Date: December 14, 2020ORDER OF APPOINTMENT FILED.
Date: December 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DROPPED/ABANDONED ON CNT:1 | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION FILED. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | PLEA OF NOT GUILTY FILED. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | EVENT CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 2/3/2021 AT 10:35 IN COURTROOM IN THE COURTHOUSE WITH JUDGE KATHY GARNER | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY'S EMAIL ADDRESS(ES) FILED. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: JENNA VON SEE | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ROR SLIP FILED. | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONFLICT COUNSEL FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.