Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED AFTER RE-OPEN | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO REOPEN ESTATE AND FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN O.R. BOOK 920 PAGES 427-428 | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO REOPEN ESTATE AND FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION CHECKLIST | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSED PROBATE REOPEN FEE OF $50.00 | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PERS REP ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: MATT MATHEWS | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202204696 | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE RE-OPENED. REASON : REOPEN CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.