Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Richard, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcmichen, Colin L, against Roberts And Roberts Inc, represented by Puritz, Steven Michael, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with ALLMAN, FRANCIS J JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALLMAN, FRANCIS J JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE FROM NON PARTIES | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: ALLMAN , FRANCIS J. Assigned | |
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO SECOND INTERROGATORIES | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.