Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Franklin, Bain, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Florida Department Of Correcti, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, TERRY POWELL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, TERRY POWELL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FIVE ATTACHMENTS | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: LEWIS , TERRY P Assigned | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: ALLMAN , FRANCIS J. Assigned | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED AFFIDAVIT | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC OF LIS PENDENS | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.