Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The St Joe Company, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Franklin County, represented by Shuler, Thomas Michael, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with REYNOLDS III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREYNOLDS III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | STATUS REPORT AND RENEWED MOTION FOR ABATEMENT | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: LEWIS , TERRY P Assigned | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF ABATEMENT GRANTED | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER ON FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND MOTION TO ABATE | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: ALLMAN , FRANCIS J. Assigned | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: FULFORD III, JACKIE L Assigned | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ABATE PROCEEDINGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.