Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cadcradc Vemtire 2011-1 Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Valley, Mary-Beth Theresa, against Gray, Sidney E, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, FL, . Franklin County, FL Superior Courts with REYNOLDS, GEORGE SPEARS III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREYNOLDS, GEORGE SPEARS III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ON ACTION ON PROMISSORY NOTE | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ON ACTION ON PROMISSORY NOTE | |
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES COSTS AND AFFIDAVIT BY EXPERS OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING LOAN DOCUMENTS EFILED WITH NO ATTACHMENTS | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Judge: REYNOLDS III, GEORGE S Assigned | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.