Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lendor, Ruth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Farhat, Said Sammy, against Meyers, William, Progressive American Insurance Company, Rides Taxi Service Llc, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Ruth Lendor against Rides Taxi Service, LLC, Progressive American Insurance Company, and William Meyers. The estimated value of the claim is over $30,000. Ruth Lendor is a resident of Flagler County, Florida, while Progress...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 01, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: February 03, 2022PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: July 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT WILLIAM MYERS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PRIVILEGE LOG | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.