Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mclain, Robert A, Scudder, Laurence R, against Adler, Braian, Adler, Jade Merriman, City Of Palm Coast, Unknown Spouse Of Braiain Adler, Unknown Spouse Of Jade Merriman Adler, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a verified complaint for foreclosure of a mortgage filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Securities Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-KS9, again...
COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - BRAIN ADLER
Date: April 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RESPONSIBLE LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: March 25, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- CITY OF PALM COAST
Date: February 25, 2021PAYMENT $966.00 RECEIPT #2021003033
Date: February 26, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- BRAIAN ADLER
Date: February 25, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JADE MERRIMAN
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.2531.1933. / 2021010149)
Date: February 25, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: February 25, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRAIAN ADLER
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.2662.565. / 2022010520)
Date: February 25, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET
Date: February 25, 2022SUMMONS PREPARED- JADE MARRIMAN ADLER
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RESPONSIBLE ATTORNEY
Date: June 29, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: June 09, 2021PAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #2022003047
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: March 01, 2021CIVIL VALUE SHEET
Date: February 25, 2021MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: March 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #2022003047 | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDING FEES ASSESSED $9.00 | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | INDEXING ASSESSED $0.00 | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ARTICLE V RECORDING FEE ASSESSED $8.00 | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MODERNIZATION TRUST FUND ASSESSED $1.50 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.2662.565. / 2022010520) | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RESPONSIBLE ATTORNEY | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - BRAIN ADLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.