Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Parrish, Sheryll, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kupcinskas, Mark J Jr, against Perfect Pizza Pie Inc, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Negligence Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Sheryll Parrish against Perfect Pizza Pie Inc. The plaintiff is seeking damages that exceed $30,000, exclusive of costs, interest, and attorneys' fees. The estimated value of the claim is stated as $30,001 on the civil cove...
COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: March 30, 2022CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: February 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL REQUIRING MEDIATION AND DIRECTING PRE TRIAL PROCEDURE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT FOR CONTINUANCE | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.