Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Caldwell, Thomas E, Underhill, Nancy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Caldwell, Thomas E, against Bennici, Marieclaire, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Nancy Underhill against Marieclaire Bennici in the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in Flagler County, Florida. The case number is 2021 CA 000081. The complaint states that the action is for damages exceeding $...
COMPLAINT
Date: February 12, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 12, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: February 12, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 05, 2021PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ANSWER TO INTERROGATORS
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: July 13, 2021AMENDED RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION
Date: May 18, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 12, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: August 16, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 03, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 23, 2021DEFENDANT MARIECLAIRE BENNICIS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 1.720
Date: February 23, 2022SUMMONS PREPARED- MARIECLAIRE BENNICI
Date: February 12, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: October 05, 2021DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: June 25, 2021AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPOSITION VIA VIDEO TELECONFERENCE
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 24, 2021SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA VIDEO TELECONFERENCE
Date: February 15, 2022DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: August 16, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 18, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: February 12, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021002416
Date: February 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MARIECLAIRE BENNICIS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 1.720 | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA VIDEO TELECONFERENCE | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPOSITION VIA VIDEO TELECONFERENCE | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ANSWER TO INTERROGATORS | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.