Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Direct General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mcfarlane, William J Iii, against Cruz, Angel Enrique, Peralta, Victor Jose, Torres, Jonaell R, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
CORRESPONDENCE
Date: February 10, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST DEFENDANT
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MAILING COPIES
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 08, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 26, 2022PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ANGEL ENRIQUE CRUZ
Date: February 12, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT VICTOR JOSE PERALTA
Date: February 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MAILING COPIES | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST DEFENDANT | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS ANGEL ENRIQUE CRUZ, VICTOR JOSE PERALTA, AND VICTOR JOSE PERALTA AS THE PARENT, NATURAL AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF JONAELL R TORRES A MINOR | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TAX COSTS | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.