Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williams, Kendra, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brown, J Schuyler, against Circle K Stores Inc, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Negligence Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Kendra Williams against Circle K Stores, Inc. The complaint alleges personal injury that occurred on December 29, 2019, in Bunnell, Flagler County, Florida. Kendra Williams, the plaintiff, is a resident of Deland, Volusia C...
RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- CIRCLE K STORES INC.
Date: March 02, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021002120
Date: February 10, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: February 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- CIRCLE K STORES INC. | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- CIRCLE K STORES INC. | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021002120 | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS PREPARED- CIRCLES K STORES, INC. | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.