Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Taubina, Natalya, Taubin, Dmitriy, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Tomlinson, Brandon Joel, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Andreacchi, Isabel, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Dmitriy Taubin and Natalya Taubin against Defendant American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida. The Plaintiffs allege that they are the owners of real property in Palm Coast, Florida, and that they have a va...
PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 15, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 15, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA'S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION IF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.