Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Johnson, Harriet S, The Estate Of Harry Johnson Jr, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Wilander, Carl R, against Alvarez, Norma, Florida Facilities Llc, Gulf Coast Health Care Holdings Llc, Hc Navigator Llc, Mf Flagler Llc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Negligence Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2021ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL REQUIRING MEDIATION AND DIRECTING PRE TRIAL PROCEDURE
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF ZOOM LOGIN INFORMATION | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF STAY DUE TO BANKRUPTCY AS TO ALL PENDING CLAIMS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.