Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sysenlath, Vee, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Weisser, Kevin, against First Protective Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Vee Sysenlath against First Protective Insurance Company, also known as Frontline Insurance. The jurisdiction of this court is invoked as the action is for breach of contract relating to benefits under a policy of insurance...
PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 11, 2021PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: June 11, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: February 15, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: May 28, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 11, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 11, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 11, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021000554
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021000554 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEES (SUMMONS) ASSESSED $10.00 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE OTHER ASSESSED $400.00 | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.