Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williams, Sandra, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Hamilton, David, against Beckwith, Patti Jo, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.2614.195. / 2021055320)
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- PATTI JO BECKWITH | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021002797 | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS PREPARED- PATTIJO BECKWITH | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.2614.195. / 2021055320) | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $409.00 RECEIPT #2021000537 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS DEPOSIT - FROM EPORTAL ASSESSED $4.00 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS DEPOSIT - FROM EPORTAL ASSESSED $5.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.