Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kolrei International Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Manzo, Isaac, against Gutierrez, Eudelfa, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property $0 - 50K |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal action filed by KOLREI INTERNATIONAL LLC in the Circuit Court of Flagler County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking to quiet title to a real property located in Flagler County. The plaintiff obtained a tax deed for the proper...
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: January 05, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE - Recorded (OR.2524.444. / 2021006330)
Date: February 06, 2021CORRESPONDENCE
Date: February 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | |||
April 03, 2024 | |||
April 02, 2024 | |||
April 02, 2024 | |||
April 02, 2024 | |||
April 01, 2024 | |||
April 01, 2024 | |||
April 01, 2024 | |||
February 06, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE - Recorded (OR.2524.444. / 2021006330) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.