Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Szymanski, Mateusz, against Morris, Sherry J, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Sherry J Morris in the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in Flagler County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant breached their duty by failing to make periodic payment...
MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 05, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2021STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT
Date: July 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND DISMISSAL | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED- SHERRY J MORRIS | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.