Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lilavois, Ralph Christian, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Duff, Erin Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY - Recorded (OR.2246.1543. / 2017043356) | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE/ Pages: 1 | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | LEFT BLANK INTENTIONALLY/ Pages: 1 | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE ERIN ELIZABETH DUFF (RESPONDENT); | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY - Recorded (OR.2363.1048. / 2019022422) | |
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT EVENT: HEARING DATE: 01/26/2010 TIME: 1:30 PM JUDGE: ZAMBRANO, JUDGE RAUL LOCATION: COURTROOM 402/ Pages: 1 | |
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.