Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Evans, Dawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Evans, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with CRAIG, DENNIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCRAIG, DENNIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | AUDIT | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE DAWN EVANS | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL FINDINGS ACCOMPANYING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF HEARING OFFICER/FINAL ORDER OF CONTEMPT | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHOLDING FOR SUPPORT | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL QUESTIONNAIRE | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON CONTEMPT | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 03/13/2013 AT 8:30 AM IN 101/ , JDG: HEARING OFFICER, CHILD SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.